Grant, Kelly Erin (CPSO#: 75038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Flemingdon Community Health Centre
10 Gateway Boulevard
Don Mills ON  M3C 3A1
Phone: (416) 429-4991
Fax: (416) 422-3573
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2233 Kipling Avenue
Toronto ON  M9W 4L3
Canada
Phone: 416-392-2300
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lewis and Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Grant ( CPSO# 75038 )
Dr. M. Lewis ( CPSO# 75081 )

Business Address:
Flemington Community Health Centre
10 Gateway Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 429-4991

Business Address:
2233 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L3
Phone Number: (416) 392-2300

Business Address:
5935 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y8
Phone Number: (416) 223-4050

Business Address:
82 Buttonwood Avenue
York ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 614-9494

Business Address:
1000 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 5G2
Phone Number: (416) 291-0222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY ERIN GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2002