Grant, Robin Patricia (CPSO#: 97718)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 02 May 2017 to 29 May 2017
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2017