Grasemann, Hartmut (CPSO#: 83612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Aug 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Gesamthochschule Essen, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Respiratory Medicine
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-2196
Fax: (416) 813-6246
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Aug 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2011 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Hartmut Grasemann may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Grasemann  holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements  of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  will  automatically expire when Dr. Grasemann no longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.