Grasso, Francesco Antonio (CPSO#: 89510)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universita di Milano, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011