Gray, Donovan O'Gilvie Norman (CPSO#: 60858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 1600
275 8th Street
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Phone: (705) 272-4200
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donovan Gray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 16 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONOVAN O'GILVIE NORMAN GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1989