Gray, Phebe (CPSO#: 79110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Gray, Phebe Mildred (used until: 11 Apr 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone: (705) 746-2181
Fax: (705) 746-4753
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moquin, Shaw, Gray, Brennan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaw ( CPSO# 64916 )
Dr. D. Moquin ( CPSO# 64177 )
Dr. K. Moquin ( CPSO# 64194 )
Dr. P. Gray ( CPSO# 79110 )
Dr. J. Brennan ( CPSO# 57131 )

Business Address:
101 - 60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone Number: (705) 746-2181


Corporation Name: Phebe Gray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gray ( CPSO# 79110 )

Business Address:
101 - 60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone Number: (705) 746-2181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHEBE GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005