Graybiel, Kerry Manuel (CPSO#: 89089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
1017 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 742-2961
Fax: (416) 742-0076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Graybiel and Dupuis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dupuis ( CPSO# 96595 )
Dr. K. Graybiel ( CPSO# 89089 )

Business Address:
57 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1G2
Phone Number: (905) 764-7799

Business Address:
36B Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1A9
Phone Number: (416) 961-0113

Business Address:
Suite 401
1017 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 742-2961

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERRY MANUEL GRAYBIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAYBIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2015