Greavette, Thomas Ford (CPSO#: 80971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montebello Medical Centre
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone: (905) 685-6555 Ext. 2
Fax: (905) 685-6093
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tom Greavette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Greavette ( CPSO# 80971 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone Number: (905) 685-6555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS FORD GREAVETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREAVETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2008