Grebenyuk, Liliya (CPSO#: 95519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Kazakh State Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Canada
Phone: 519-766-1360
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liliya Grebenyuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Grebenyuk ( CPSO# 95519 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIYA GREBENYUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREBENYUK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2014