Green, Daniel Marc (CPSO#: 77929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4964
Fax: (905) 721-6614
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Green ( CPSO# 77929 )

Business Address:
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Lower Level
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4964

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL MARC GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006