Green, Kristy-Jill Renee (CPSO#: 79629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Xenoyannis ( CPSO# 80825 )
Dr. K. Green ( CPSO# 79629 )

Business Address:
104 - 333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 290-2460

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 537-5951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTY-JILL RENEE GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2006