Green, Lawrence Darren (CPSO#: 72391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B7B
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 623-1114
Fax: (519) 623-1814
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Darren Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Green ( CPSO# 72391 )

Business Address:
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Suite B7B
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 623-1114

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 31, 2012
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On January 11, 2013, Cambridge Memorial Hospital notified the College that effective October 2012, Dr. Green has voluntarily restricted his practise to no longer perform abdominal peritoneal resection and low anterior resection.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 27, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lawrence Darren
            Green, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Green to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        Dr. Green has voluntarily ceased to perform abdominal peritoneal
                        resection and low anterior resection.