Green, Nicole Michelle (CPSO#: 88804)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Queen Elizabeth Hospital 60 Riverside Drive Charlottetown PE C1A 8T5
Date Received: 26 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2017