Green, Ruth-Ann Feliksa (CPSO#: 82581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: Stewart, Ruth-Ann Feliksa (used until: 30 Oct 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruth-Ann Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Green ( CPSO# 82581 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH-ANN FELIKSA GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 06 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2009 to 17 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 18 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2010