Greene, Treena Ann (CPSO#: 88991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Ottawa ON  K4M 1B2
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREENA ANN GREENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2008