Greenough, Mary Catherine (CPSO#: 55670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
350 John St.
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-8090
Fax: (613) 623-9631
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Greenough Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Greenough ( CPSO# 55670 )

Business Address:
206 - 350 John Street
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-8090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY CATHERINE GREENOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENOUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1986