Greenwald, Joseph Aryeh (CPSO#: 86773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: (905) 527-1941
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. A. Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Greenwald ( CPSO# 86773 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ARYEH GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2010 to 13 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012