Greenway, Matthew John (CPSO#: 87825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone: (905) 685-6555
Fax: (905) 685-6558
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tabor Manor Long Term Care
1 Tabor Drive
St Catharines ON  L2N 1V9
Canada
Phone: (905) 934-2548
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Reilly & Greenway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. O'Reilly ( CPSO# 87199 )
Dr. M. Greenway ( CPSO# 87825 )

Business Address:
Montebello Medical Centre
8 - 118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone Number: (905) 685-6555

Business Address:
78 Yates Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5R9
Phone Number: (905) 685-9155

Business Address:
1 Tabor Drive
St Catharines ON  L2N 1V9
Phone Number: (905) 934-2548

Business Address:
Ridley College
2 Ridley Road
St Catharines ON  L2R 7C3
Phone Number: (905) 684-1889

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOHN GREENWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 24 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2009