Greenwood, Eric David (CPSO#: 89652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cincinnati, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Mar 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr Eric David Greenwood may practice medicine independently in Anaesthesiology,
            only.