Greer, Mary-Louise Catherine (CPSO#: 73273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7874
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mary-Louise Catherine Greer may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Greer  holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Greer  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.