Greiner, Karin Louise (CPSO#: 72190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5120
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Voros Greiner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. K. Greiner ( CPSO# 72190 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 643-1140

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-6196

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIN LOUISE GREINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2001