Grendarova, Petra (CPSO#: 88844)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Martin, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 31 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009