Grewal, Jaspreet Singh (CPSO#: 73670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1995A Weston Rd
Toronto ON  M9N1X2
Phone: (416) 242-2216
Fax: (416) 242-9751
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

900 Albion Rd
Toronto ON  M9V1A5
Canada
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 416-367-4301
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2549 Weston Rd
Toronto ON  M9N 2A7
Canada
Phone: 416-240-8282
Fax: 416-240-8870
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

106 - 1620 Albion Rd
Toronto ON  M9N 4B4
Canada
Phone: 416-742-1500
Fax: 416-741-1506
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.S. Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grewal ( CPSO# 73670 )

Business Address:
1995A Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 1X2
Phone Number: (416) 242-2216

Business Address:
900 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1A5
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Business Address:
2549 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 240-8282

Business Address:
1175 Queen Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1J4
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASPREET SINGH GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001