Grewal, Kamal Preet Kaur (CPSO#: 92135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Rajasthan University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Health Medical Centre and
Walk-In Clinic
Unit 11
10035 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Z 0E6
Phone: (905) 453-2441
Fax: (905) 453-4624
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamal Preet Kaur Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Grewal ( CPSO# 92135 )

Business Address:
Family Health Medical Centre and Walk-In Clinic
Unit 11
10035 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L6Z 0E6
Phone Number: (905) 453-2441

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMAL PREET KAUR GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011