Grieve-Eglin, Leandra Helena (CPSO#: 86401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Basel, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Suart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grieve-Eglin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Grieve-Eglin ( CPSO# 86401 )

Business Address:
Internal Medicine Department
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Dept. of Internal Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Switzerland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEANDRA HELENA GRIEVE-EGLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIEVE-EGLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012