Griffin, Lisa Jill (CPSO#: 77652)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004