Griffiths, Jane Madeleine (CPSO#: 55673)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Griffiths Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Griffiths ( CPSO# 55673 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine Centre
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Medical Records Location

Address: Queen's Family Health Team 220 Bagot St Kingston ON K7L 5E9
Date Received: 17 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018