Griffiths, Patricia Eola (CPSO#: 29974)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: Griffiths-Smith, Patricia Eola (used until: 22 Jul 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Griffiths Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 500 - 267 O'Connor Street Ottawa ON K2P 1V3
Date Received: 04 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018