Grigoriu, Ariadna-Cristina (CPSO#: 79286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
High Risk Pregnancy Clinic
Valley House
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3552
Fax: (905) 813-3570
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ariadna C. Grigoriu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grigoriu ( CPSO# 79286 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
High Risk Pregnancy Clinic
Valley House
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4031

Business Address:
63 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 683-4411

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIADNA-CRISTINA GRIGORIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIGORIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010