Grill, Allan Kevin (CPSO#: 74728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Health Team
377 Church Street
Suite 101
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Long-Term Care
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room KGE31
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4830
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham, Ontario
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7058
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan K. Grill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grill ( CPSO# 74728 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7058

Business Address:
620 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2L7
Phone Number: (416) 971-9800

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room KGE 31
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Markham Family Physicians
101 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN KEVIN GRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 03 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2002 to 03 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2003 to 03 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2004