Griller, Nadia Leah (CPSO#: 95061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite HG 52
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4727
Fax: 416-480-5977
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 23 Feb 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA LEAH GRILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016