Grinman, Michelle Nora (CPSO#: 86050)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle N. Grinman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 7007 14th Street SW Calgary AB T2V 1P9
Date Received: 06 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2007 to 04 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2016