Grise, Mary Eleanor (CPSO#: 71734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Kids Place
400 McKeown Ave.
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Grise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grise ( CPSO# 71734 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
One Kids Place
400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 476-5437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ELEANOR GRISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRISE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2001