Gronska, Margaret Anna (CPSO#: 79114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jane Medical Clinic
Unit 101
2780 Jane Street
North York ON  M3N 2J2
Phone: (416) 745-8500
Fax: (416) 748-8730
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gronska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gronska ( CPSO# 79114 )

Business Address:
Jane Medical Clinic
Unit 101
2780 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3N 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 745-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNA GRONSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRONSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005