Groot, Emily Rose (CPSO#: 97893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Office of the Chief Coroner
Second Floor
199 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5P9
Phone: 705-564-6149
Fax: (807) 625-5973
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY ROSE GROOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017