Grossman, Harold Jay (CPSO#: 13028)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 15-Nov-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1950
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1991