Grouhi, Shahpar (CPSO#: 80543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tabriz University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T9
Phone: (905) 884-5638
Fax: (905) 884-8068
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grouhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grouhi ( CPSO# 69470 )
Dr. S. Grouhi ( CPSO# 80543 )

Business Address:
9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 884-5638

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2310

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHPAR GROUHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROUHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2015