Groves, John Tear (CPSO#: 18928)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1996

Summary

Date of Death: 31-Jan-2005

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 09 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1996