Gruber, Dinah Cecilia (CPSO#: 21216)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 307 Sheppard Ave W Toronto ON M2N 1N6
Date Received: 01 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2018