Gruder, Alicja Natalia (CPSO#: 83975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Lanark County
Community Health Centre
207 Robertson Drive
Lanark ON  K0G 1K0
Phone: (613) 259-2182
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICJA NATALIA GRUDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2006 to 05 Apr 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Apr 2006 to 16 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2007 to 16 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2008