Grujich, Nikola (CPSO#: 84659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
F Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4693
Fax: (416) 480-5318
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Grujich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Grujich ( CPSO# 84659 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room 30 F Wing
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKOLA GRUJICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUJICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011