Gryn, Steven Ely (CPSO#: 90550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2922
Fax: (519) 663-3217
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-2922
Fax: (519) 663-3217
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gryn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gryn ( CPSO# 90550 )

Business Address:
LHSC-University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2922

Business Address:
LHSC-Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-2922

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN ELY GRYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013