Grynspan, Bernard (CPSO#: 84450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Western University
Student Health Services
University Community Centre
Room 11
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fanshawe College Health Services
Fowler Kennedy Sport Med. Clinic
Room j1004
1001 Fanshawe College BLVD
London ON  N5Y5R6
Canada
Phone: 519-452-4230
Fax: 519-452-4415
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD GRYNSPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYNSPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012