Grzyb, Magdalena Julia (CPSO#: 93206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 208
1100 Avenue Beaumont
Montreal QC  H3P 3E5
Phone: (514) 739-4989
Fax: (514) 739-8985

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGDALENA JULIA GRZYB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRZYB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 11 Jul 2016 to 22 Jul 2016
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2017