Guaiana, Giuseppe (CPSO#: 91426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 27 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Milan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Ext. 2792
Fax: (519) 631-6497
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giuseppe Guaiana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Guaiana ( CPSO# 91426 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Insititue
Mental Health Care Building
F4-430 - 550 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE GUAIANA may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF PSYCHIATRY, UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. GUAIANA holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. GUAIANA may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. GUAIANA no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. GUAIANA no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. GUAIANA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2018