Gubbay, Jonathan Benjamin (CPSO#: 83756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of New South Wales, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Laboratory Toronto
Ontario Agency for Health
Protection and Promotion
600 University Avenue, Suite 1701
Toronto ON  M5G 1M1
Phone: (647) 792-3170
Fax: (416) 649-4512
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Infectious Diseases
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 404
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gubbay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gubbay ( CPSO# 83756 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 250-5000

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Suite 404
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-9898

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 22 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN BENJAMIN GUBBAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUBBAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2005 to 09 Dec 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 10 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 24 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2007 to 24 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2009