Guerra, Vitor Coimbra (CPSO#: 80030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Mar 2016

Expiry Date:  13 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Mar 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Mar 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 23 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 13 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Vitor Coimbra Guerra may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto, in which Dr. Guerra holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Guerra no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Guerra's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Guerra's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on March 30, 2016, and  currently  has  an
                  interim  expiry  date of January 13,  2019.   The  expiry  date  of  this
                  certificate may be  extended,  subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2
                  and 3 above.