Guiang, Charlie Bobby (CPSO#: 75885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Centre at 410
St Michael's
410 Sherbourne Street 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 867-3728
Fax: (416) 867-3726
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Covenant House Health Care Services
Inner City Health Associates (ICHA)
200 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1S9
Canada
Phone: (416) 204-7995
Fax: (416) 204-7089
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

66 Gerrard Street East
2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
Phone: 416-922-0566
Fax: 416-922-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLIE BOBBY GUIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUIANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2001 to 07 Mar 2001
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002