Guirguis, Sandra (CPSO#: 96082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Streetsville Medical Centre
5425 Creditview Road
Unit 8
Mississauga ON  L5V2P3
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandra Guirguis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Guirguis ( CPSO# 96082 )

Business Address:
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA GUIRGUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUIRGUIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013