Gula, Lorne Jeffrey (CPSO#: 71245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
C6-110
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Cardiac Institute
1055 Fanshawe Road West, London, ON
London ON  N6A 5P6
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1584
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gula Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gula ( CPSO# 71245 )

Business Address:
C6 110 - 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3746

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE JEFFREY GULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001